This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/28/2021 at 12:37:39 (UTC).

CORONA NORTH MAIN VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 CORONA NORTH MAIN filed a Property - Controlled Substance/Drug Eviction lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0832

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Controlled Substance/Drug Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT, LLC

Defendant

ANDRES MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A BRISCO & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Corona)

01/31/2020: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Corona)

Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

01/31/2020: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

01/31/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT, LLC and filed.

01/31/2020: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT, LLC and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

01/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY on 12/01/20 at 1:00 in Department C1.

10/27/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY on 12/01/20 at 1:00 in Department C1.

Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed

11/05/2020: Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal for Failure to Comply with COVID-19 Tenant Relief Act of 2020 (Corona); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY on 12/01/20 at 1:00 in Department C1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/03/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #5004 Receipt No.: CV200203-0382-FE.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/03/2020; Fine Description: American Express Receipt No.: CV200203-0381-AE.1; Paid: $270.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT, LLC and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Corona)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFilings: Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT, LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 11/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less