This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 20:14:50 (UTC).

CORONA NORTH MAIN VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 CORONA NORTH MAIN filed a Property - Controlled Substance/Drug Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1803

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Controlled Substance/Drug Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendants

ALBERT RINCON

DELIA LOPEZ

YURI SERNA

MARIA WELBOURNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A BRISCO & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Corona)

03/13/2020: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Corona)

Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

03/13/2020: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

03/13/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC and filed.

03/13/2020: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

03/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Request for Posting of Summons & Complaint CCP 415.45 by CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC filed.

10/19/2020: Request for Posting of Summons & Complaint CCP 415.45 by CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC filed.

Order for Posting & Mailing of Summons and Complaint; Honorable Judge Christopher B. Harmon.

10/19/2020: Order for Posting & Mailing of Summons and Complaint; Honorable Judge Christopher B. Harmon.

Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed

10/23/2020: Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal WITHOUT prejudice Entire Action filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order for Posting & Mailing of Summons and Complaint; Honorable Judge Christopher B. Harmon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Posting of Summons & Complaint CCP 415.45 by CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2020; Fine Description: American Express Receipt No.: CV201014-0173-AE.1; Paid: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper in unlawful detainer amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/16/2020; Fine Description: American Express Receipt No.: CV200316-0246-AE.1; Paid: $270.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Clerk's Notice of Complaint for Unlawful Detainer and Notice of Case Assignment to Departments for All Purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint filed - Unlawful Detainer Under $10,000.(Corona)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketFilings: Unlawful Detainer Complaint of CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 10/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less