Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/04/2019 at 23:00:48 (UTC).

COOPER ENGINEERING INC VS ADVANCED CONCRETE SAWING

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 COOPER ENGINEERING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADVANCED CONCRETE SAWING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6591

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER ENGINEERINGINC

Defendant

ADVANCED CONCRETE SAWING AND SEALING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLADYCH & ASSOCIATES

1400 N Bristol St #210

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/10/2018 OF COOPER ENGINEERINGINC SERVED ON ADVANCED CONCRETE SAWING AND SEALING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/13/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/10/2018 OF COOPER ENGINEERINGINC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/10/2018 OF COOPER ENGINEERINGINC SERVED ON ADVANCED CONCRETE SAWING AND SEALING INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/13/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/08/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/10/2018 OF COOPER ENGINEERINGINC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOPER ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant