This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/16/2018 at 12:35:17 (UTC).

CONWAY VS CULVER-NEWLIN

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 CONWAY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CULVER-NEWLIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1042

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

AVEREE CONWAY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SCOTT BAILEY

CULVER-NEWLIN INC

DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A

KIRSTEN WRIGHT

ANN MORALES

DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

WALTER CLARK LEGALGROUP

72-098 Hwy 111

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MCCUNE & HARBER, LLP

515 S Figueroa Street Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ON

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY CHANGING DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES OFFICE FOR CULVER-NEWLIN INC TO DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES DIFFERENT BRANCH OFFICE FILED.

MINUTE ORDER: RE 10/25/18 HEAR

MINUTE ORDER: RE 10/25/18 HEARING

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH W CHEUNG

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH W CHEUNG IN SUPPORT OF CONCURRENTLY FILED STIP/ORDER THEREON RE VACATE COURT DISMISSAL FILED

FILED: STIPULATION AND ORDER T

FILED: STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON RE VACATE COURT DISM ISSAL OF DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2018 OF CULVER-NEWLIN INC BY DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DESERT SAND

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER, LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2018 OF DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CULVER-NEWL

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CULVER-NEWLIN INC REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/03/2018 OF CULVER-NEWLIN INC AND FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY D

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CULVER-NEWLIN INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AVEREE CONWAY

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FO

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY BY SCOTT BAILEY REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY BY DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A, ANN MORALES, KIRSTEN WRIGHT REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURR

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER BY DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISM

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF SPECIFIC CAUSES OF ACTIONS AGAINSTSCHOOL DISTRICT DEFENDANTS IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMUR

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON RE VACATE COURT DISM ISSAL OF DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOSEPH W CHEUNG IN SUPPORT OF CONCURRENTLY FILED STIP/ORDER THEREON RE VACATE COURT DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY PARTY NOT AT-ISSUE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SUBMITTED BY CULVER-NEWLIN INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: RE 10/25/18 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • HR HEARING SET FOR 10/25/18 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: ALL PATIES NOW AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • --ALSO CHANGE FIRM NAME (ALL COMPLAINTS OF DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FOR CULVER-NEWLIN INC TO DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY CHANGING DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES OFFICE FOR CULVER-NEWLIN INC TO DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES DIFFERENT BRANCH OFFICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY SERVED ON KIRSTEN WRIGHT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/20/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY SERVED ON ANN MORALES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/20/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY AS TO CULVER-NEWLIN INC; MAILING DATE OF 03/01/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY AS TO DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A; MAILING DATE OF 03/01/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/21/2018 OF AVEREE CONWAY AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF AVEREE CONWAY NAMED AS JAMES CONWAY IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE ELDEN S. FOX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/23/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant