This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 14:07:38 (UTC).

Conservatorship of: MARIA EUGENIA SAUCEDA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Conservatorship of MARIA EUGENIA SAUCEDA was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Evans. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0370

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John G. Evans

 

Party Details

Conservatee

MARIA EUGENIA SAUCEDA

Not Yet Classified

DULCE BAEZ

MARIA ELENA SAUCEDA

EDITH BAEZ

ROSARIO SAUCEDA

MARCELINA SAUCEDA

JUAN BAEZ

BARTOLO SAUCEDA

CINDY BAEZ

ANTONIA SAUCEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Susan A. Katzen

Nenaver Tabu Sheldon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Declaration in Support of Order Dispensing with Accounting (PRc 2628) filed by EDITH BAEZ; Judicial Officer: John G. Evans; Location/Courtroom: Department PS3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/06/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9466 Receipt No.: 20211006-00906.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Hearing (Guardianships or Conservatorship) (GC-020) re: Declaration In Support Of Order Dispensing With Account Under C Section 2628 on Declaration in Support of Order Dispensing with Accounting (PrC 2628) filed by EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Hearing (Guardianship or Conservatorship) (GC-020/GC-020(P)) re: Declaration in Support of Order Dispensing with Account Under PC Section 2628

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Declaration in Support of Order Dispensing with Accounting (PrC 2628) filed by EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Confidential Conservatorship Medical/Clets Information; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Conservatorship Report of the Court Investigator (Annual Accounting Review); Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order Appointing Court Investigator Conservatorship Review on Declaration in Support of Order Dispensing with Accounting (PrC 2628) filed by EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Ex Parte Order Authorizing Disclosure of (Proposed) Conservatee's Health Information (Form). on Declaration in Support of Order Dispensing with Accounting (PrC 2628) filed by EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/12/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9466 Receipt No.: 20210812-00298.1; Paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Record Check Request; Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Probate Investigator Referral Form.; Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook. (GC-348); Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Petitioner regarding Conservatorships/Trusts, Trust Accounts, Conservator as Trustee and Court Jurisdiction of Trust.; Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Confidential Supplemental Information.; Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship. (GC-335); Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Assignment. (Probate); Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Appointment of Conservator of the Person.; Filed By: JUAN BAEZ; EDITH BAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketFilings: Subsequent Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person appointing EDITH BAEZ, JUAN BAEZ; Disposition: Granted 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Appointment for Conservatorship of the Person Appointing JUAN BAEZ, EDITH BAEZ; Disposition: Judgment (Permanent Letters) 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHELDON NENAVER TABU

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZEN, SUSAN A