This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 23:59:06 (UTC).

Conservatorship of: D'ANGELO SIMMONS

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Conservatorship of D'ANGELO SIMMONS was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Evans. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1065

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John G. Evans

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

INLAND REGIONAL CENTER

ANA PEREZ

D'ANGELO SIMMONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Steven K. Beckett

Jonathan Daniel Winters

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingProbate Notes: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Why the Court should not dismiss the petition for failure to address the notes ANA PEREZ at 8:45 AM in Department PS3; Details; RECOMMENDATIONS; To be determined by Judge; REQUESTS; At hearing on 07/08/21, court set this OSC re: dismissal for failure to address the notes; Examined by J. Real on 08/16/21; Reviewed by J. Real on 09/14/21. No new documents filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingProbate Notes: Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Conservator of the Person Appointing ANA PEREZ at 8:45 AM in Department PS3; Details; RECOMMENDATIONS; Continue for capacity declaration; REQUESTS; Petitioner is/are Ana Perez, parent; Petitioner(s) request(s) appointment as conservator of the person of D'Angelo Simmons.; Petitioner requests finding that Proposed Conservatee lacks capacity to give informed medical consent.; Determine voting capacity: Able per Investigator's report; Conservatee must appear at the hearing, be informed by the court, and findings must be made. Probate Code 1825, 1828.; Court must find that conservatorship is the least restrictive alternative for the protection of the conservatee. Probate Code 1800.3.; Objections filed by D'ANGELO SIMMONS (proposed conservatee) 01/15/21; Court referred to Letter from IRC - Proposed Conservatee is not a consumer.; The following documents must be filed by ANA PEREZ before 12/29/2021: (1) Notice of Conservatees Rights (form GC-341), and (2) Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care (form GC-355).; Annual conservatorship investigation concerning ANA PEREZ should be assigned to an investigator after 06/15/2022; Conservator(s) to be advised of their obligation to keep a current address and phone number filed with the court.; DEFICIENCIES; Capacity regarding Medical Consent - no Physician's Declaration on file; QUESTIONS; Question if limited conservatorship would be appropriate?; Question if court wishes to appoint counsel?; PROPOSED ORDER; Order submitted incorrect at item 4b.; Letters submitted.; 4 continuance(s); Examined by L. Crosby on 12/28/20; Updated by S. Garcia on 01/12/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 01/28/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 02/08/21; Updated by H. Gonzalez on 02/25/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 04/06/21; Updated by S. Garcia on 04/20/21; Reviewed by S. Garcia on 05/04/21. No new documents filed.; Updated by S. Cruz on 06/03/21; Reviewed by H. Gonzales on 07/02/21. No new documents filed.; Updated by J Real on 08/16/21; Reviewed by J. Real on 09/14/21. No new documents filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Why the Court should not dismiss the petition for failure to address the notes ANA PEREZ; Judicial Officer: John G. Evans; Location/Courtroom: Department PS3; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Conservator of the Person Appointing ANA PEREZ; Judicial Officer: John G. Evans; Location/Courtroom: Department PS3; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Fee Waiver Expiration : D'ANGELO SIMMONS; Expiration Date: 11/16/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Why the Court should not dismiss the petition for failure to address the notes ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Why the Court should not dismiss the petition for failure to address the notes ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Dept. PS3 - Notice of Telephonic Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Show Cause re:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing on Petition for Appointment for Conservatorship of the Person Appointing ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Probate Investigator Referral Form.; Filed By: ANA PEREZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook. (GC-348); Filed By: ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Petitioner regarding Conservatorships/Trusts, Trust Accounts, Conservator as Trustee and Court Jurisdiction of Trust.; Filed By: ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Confidential Supplemental Information.; Filed By: ANA PEREZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Assignment. (Probate); Filed By: ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Appointment of Conservator of the Person.; Filed By: ANA PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Ward or Conservatee) - Granted; Clerk:; Filed By: D'ANGELO SIMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (Ward or Conservatee). (FW-001-GC); Filed By: D'ANGELO SIMMONS; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Confidential Conservator Screening Form.; Filed By: ANA PEREZ; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Appointment for Conservatorship of the Person Appointing ANA PEREZ; Disposition: Court Ordered Dismissal 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INLAND REGIONAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKETT, STEVEN K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERS JONATHAN D. ESQ.