This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/17/2018 at 18:50:04 (UTC).

CONKLIN VS. BULTSMA

Case Summary

On 10/07/2002 CONKLIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BULTSMA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9628

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Respondent, Other and Plaintiff

DAVID CONKLIN

Others, Defendants and Appellants

RICHARD BULTSMA

DAVID CONKLIN

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF SATISFIED JUDGM

DECLARATION OF SATISFIED JUDGMENT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF SATISFACTON

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY RICHARD BULTSMA

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA;

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO

DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY RICHARD BULTSMA.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - CORONA FILED 10/07/2002 OF DAVID CONKLIN SERVED ON RICHARD BULTSMA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/15/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $35.00.

DECLARATION OF RESET FILED

DECLARATION OF RESET FILED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SATISFIED JUDGMENT ORDER FOR ENTRY OF SATISFACTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2005
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: DECL FROM DEFT-AMOUNT PAID IN FULL SUBMITTED BY RICHARD BULTSMA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • DocketHEARING ON TRIAL DE NOVO; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • DocketHEARING ON TRIAL DE NOVO IS SET FOR 2/27/03 AT 8:30IN DEPT. 05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • DocketTRIAL DE NOVO ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY RICHARD BULTSMA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: LETTER SUBMITTED BY DAVID CONKLIN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY RICHARD BULTSMA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - CORONA FILED 10/07/2002 OF DAVID CONKLIN SERVED ON RICHARD BULTSMA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/15/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $35.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CORONA; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 12/19/02 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. C2 - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF RESET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING RE-SET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2002
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UN-SERVED AS TO RICHARD BULTSMA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • DocketCLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED - CORONA (NOT USED SINCE 2006)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 11/19/02 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. C2 - CORONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL SENT TO RICHARD BULTSMA. CERTIFIED MAIL NUMBER 70020510000148126470 WITH MAILING FEE OF $8.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less