This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/13/2021 at 08:58:17 (UTC).

COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION vs DHURANDHAR

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DHURANDHAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0033

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

EXPRESS EMPLOYMENT PROFESSIONALS

Defendants

R&R LOGISTICS AND FULLFILLMENT, INC

ATUL DHURANDHAR

TURN KEY LOGISTICS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy Alan Levun

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

11/04/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/04/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/04/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000)

11/04/2020: Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

11/12/2020: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

11/13/2020: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

Amended Summons Issued and Filed.

11/13/2020: Amended Summons Issued and Filed.

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

12/11/2020: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

12/23/2020: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

01/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Roy A Levun and Summary of Action in Support of Default Judgment by Clerk

01/25/2021: Declaration of Roy A Levun and Summary of Action in Support of Default Judgment by Clerk

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

01/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

Notice of Document Return.

01/25/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Judgment by Default by Clerk on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

01/29/2021: Judgment by Default by Clerk on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

Notice of Document Return.

05/04/2021: Notice of Document Return.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; For/Against: For - COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION Against - R&R LOGISTICS AND FULLFILLMENT, INC. Against - TURN KEY LOGISTICS INC Against - ATUL DHURANDHAR; Details; Principal: $53,329.57; Costs: $529.50; Accrued Interest: $8,517.63; Attorney Fees: $1,200.00; Subtotal Judgment: $63,576.70; Total: $63,576.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Roy A Levun and Summary of Action in Support of Default Judgment by Clerk; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Summons Issued and Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/12/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *3622 Receipt No.: 20201112-00210.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000); Filed By: COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of COLLECTIVE TRADE CORPORATION; Disposition: Clerk's Default Judgment 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R&R LOGISTICS AND FULLFILLMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Express Employment Professionals, Llc.,A Florida Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where TURN KEY LOGISTICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVUN ROY ALAN