This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 10:18:44 (UTC).

COLLECTION CONSULTANTS VS NORHEIM

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 COLLECTION CONSULTANTS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORHEIM. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8817

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

DENNIS NORJEIM DDS

TRACY VEGA

DENNIS NORHEIM DDS

PALM SPRINGS SMILES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J LOVE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 So Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

Defendant Attorney

BONNIE KRAMER ESQ

225 South Civic Dr Ste 215

Palm Desert, CA 92262

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

02/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Response to order to show cause re dismissal on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

01/29/2021: Plaintiff's Response to order to show cause re dismissal on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

01/28/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

01/28/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

01/28/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

Certificate of Mailing

11/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

11/30/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Department Reassignment and Telephonic Appearance. Hearing scheduled on 12/03/20 has been rescheduled for Telephonic Appearance re: Order to Show Cause on 12/01/20 at 8:30 in Department MV1.

10/27/2020: Notice of Department Reassignment and Telephonic Appearance. Hearing scheduled on 12/03/20 has been rescheduled for Telephonic Appearance re: Order to Show Cause on 12/01/20 at 8:30 in Department MV1.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 09/02/20.

09/02/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Minute Order dated 09/02/20.

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS

09/02/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS

Declaration and Order for Bonnie Kramer in support of Cont Hearing by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS filed; Honorable Commissioner Eric V Isaac.

08/27/2020: Declaration and Order for Bonnie Kramer in support of Cont Hearing by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS filed; Honorable Commissioner Eric V Isaac.

Notice OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER/MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA filed.

08/18/2020: Notice OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER/MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA filed.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint on 09/02/20 at 8:30 in Department PS4.

08/17/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Demurrer to Complaint on 09/02/20 at 8:30 in Department PS4.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

08/07/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Request for Judicial Notice filed by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS.

08/06/2020: Request for Judicial Notice filed by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS.

Notice of Related Case by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS filed.

08/06/2020: Notice of Related Case by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS filed.

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer of Defendant Dennis Norheim/to Complaint of Plaintiff by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS filed.

08/06/2020: Notice of Hearing on Demurrer of Defendant Dennis Norheim/to Complaint of Plaintiff by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS filed.

Demurrer to Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA filed by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS represented by BONNIE KRAMER ESQ. (Over $10,000 & Under $25,000)

08/06/2020: Demurrer to Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA filed by DENNIS NORHEIM DDS represented by BONNIE KRAMER ESQ. (Over $10,000 & Under $25,000)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC re Dismissal.; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC re Dismissal.; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Response to order to show cause re dismissal on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA; Filed By: COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC re Dismissal.; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Continued - Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC re Dismissal.; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Minute Order: Courts order re 06/03/20 hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference on 06/03/20 at 8:30 in Department PS4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case reassigned to Department PS4 for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/05/2019; Fine Description: Check #0001502 Receipt No.: CV191205-0150-CK.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92264.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Limited Civil Case Assigned to Department PS4. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Palm Springs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONNIE KRAMER