This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2016 at 18:00:37 (UTC).

COACHELLA VS WALKER

Case Summary

On 06/24/2008 COACHELLA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALKER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8654

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC

Defendants

NANCY MCLAUGHLIN

SANDRA LAMBRECHT

ED D NEARY

SANTIAGO BARRIOS BONES

DIANA J WALTON

MICHAEL P DAVIS

LINDA R STRACHAN

GERTHA G POLLARD

DOUGLAS R LANG

PAUL LAMBRECHT

DANIEL REMEIKA

FIRST HORIZON HOMELOAN CORPORATION

ZIONS FIRST NATIONAL BANK

SCOTT WILLIAM MCLAUGHLIN

AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

WALKER DESIGN BUILD SERVICES LC

WILLIAM L STRACHAN

KELLY J MCCLELLAND

JANICE E NEARY

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES LAW GROUP

6 Hughs Suite 205

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

MILTNER LAW GROUP

402 W Broadway Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

ANDERSEN MANN HILBERT & PARKERLLP

1230 Columbia Street Suite 1050

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK

COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC SERVED ON PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB FILED; DATE OF MAILING 09/10/08

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC NAMING DOES 1 TO BE FIRST HORIZON HOMELOAN CORPORATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC SERVED ON PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/16/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC SERVED ON FIRST HORIZON HOMELOAN CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/08/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB REPRESENTED BY ANDERSEN MANN HILBERT & PARKERLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF TRIAL ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC AS TO MICHAEL P DAVIS WITH ASERVICE DATE OF 11/05/08 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF TRIAL ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC AS TO SCOTT WILLIAM MCLAUGHLIN WITH ASERVICE DATE OF 11/05/08 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF TRIAL ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC AS TO SIXTA VALENTIN WITH ASERVICE DATE OF 11/05/08 FILED.

REQUEST FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

REQUEST FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFT FIRST HOIZON HO BY COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY F

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY FIRST HORIZON HOMELOAN CORPORATION FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB FILED.

DECLARATION OF ANDREW M.MCKENZ

DECLARATION OF ANDREW M.MCKENZIE FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF /RE:DISC

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF /RE:DISCOVERY RESPONSES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES FILED BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB.

DECLARATION OF ANDREW M MCKENZ

DECLARATION OF ANDREW M MCKENZIE FILED

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2012
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESP OF DEFT PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION OF DOCS BY COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLTFS RESPONSES AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT BY PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB (HEARING).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • FAX FEE PAID FOR FAXED COPY OF DISMISSAL TO ANDERSEN MANN HILBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC SERVED ON FIRST HORIZON HOMELOAN CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/08/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC SERVED ON PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/16/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC NAMING DOES 1 TO BE FIRST HORIZON HOMELOAN CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC SERVED ON PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK FSB FILED; DATE OF MAILING 09/10/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOTICE OF TRIAL DEP ON PROVIDENT SAVINGS BANK SERVED ON 09/17/08 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF S&C/ALTER DISPUTE RESOLUTION/NOTICE OF TRIAL ON ZIONS FIRST NATIONAL BANK WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/10/08 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/24/2008 OF COACHELLA CAPITAL PARTNERS INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST HORIZON HOME LOAN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ZB, N. A., a National banking association is a litigant