Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 09:13:51 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES,INC.VS HOOKS

Case Summary

On 03/19/2014 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES,INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOOKS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0285

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendant

ADRIENNE HOOKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 So. Barranca Ave, #100

Covina, CA 91723

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 S. Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92230.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 03/19/2014 OF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC AS TO ADRIENNE HOOKS; MAILING DATE OF 04/21/14 FILED.

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 03/19/2014 OF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 03/19/2014 OF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC AS TO ADRIENNE HOOKS FILED.

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY FEES P

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY FEES PER 1717.5 CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE FILED

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 06/24/14

DECLARATION OF RE: ENTRY OF JU

DECLARATION OF RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON ALON DARVISH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/10/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (AFTER JUDGMENT) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (AFTER JUDGMENT) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON ALON DARVISH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/10/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (BANNING).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $122.48 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 06/24/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 03/19/2014 OF CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC AS TO ADRIENNE HOOKS; MAILING DATE OF 04/21/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) BANNING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 3/18/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92230.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE, FRANKLIN J