This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 23:17:58 (UTC).

CLARK VS VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP

Case Summary

On 03/23/2011 CLARK filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5081

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELIZABETH A SINNI

CLYDE B WISHOM.

METRE LONG WISHOM

LIMING ZHANG

WENDY CHEN

MIKE FARRAR

JASON VICKERS

BECKIE VICKERS

LEE A CLARK JR

DAPHEN CLARK

FLOYD F CZECH

JANET O CZECH

DAVID L GREENE JR

JULIETA GREENE

SUSAN LANE

CORY SCHUYLER

CRYSTAL P SCHUYLER

Interested Parties, Intervenor Plaintiffs and Intervenors

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON

CLAREMONT INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Intervenor Defendant and Intervenor Plaintiff

CLAREMONT INSURANCE COMPANY INC

109 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Intervenor Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

1230 Columbia Street Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT

5720 Oberlin Drive

San Diego, CA 92121-1723

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 North Broadway Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

Other Attorneys

PRENOVOST, NORMANDIN, BERGH & DAWE

2122 North Broadway Suite-200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

OLIVIA & ASSOCIATES ALC

11770 Bernardo Plaza Court Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92128

JENNINGS, MARC J

1551 N. Tustin Avenue Suite 100

Santa Ana, CA 92705

STUTZ, ARTIANO, SHINOFF & HOLTZ

43513 Ridge Park Drive

Temecula, CA 92590

DRISCOLL & ASSOCIATES

6960 Magnolia Avenue Suite 101

Riverside, CA 92506

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER

20201 S.W. Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

MARSHALL, FRENCH &DEGRAVE

2030 Main Street Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

HINES, SMITH, CARDER, DINCEL

3090 Bristol Street Suite 300

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LYNBERG & WATKINS

888 So. Figueroa St.

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2516

LAW OFFICES OF AARON B BOOTH

445 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 2210

Los Angeles, CA 90071

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

One Macarthur Pl., Ste. 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

ANDREWS & RHODES

21660 Copley Drive Suite 210

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY J HOGAN

2101 Corporate Center Drive Suite 150

Newbury Park, CA 91320

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Ste 105

Torrance, CA 90505

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 Town Center Dr #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP BY EXCEL CABINETS INC REPRESENTED BY DRISCOLL & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP SERVED ON FENCEWORKS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/01/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP SERVED ON RANCHO FRAMING INCORPORATED WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/01/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP SERVED ON RANCHO AIR INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/01/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/18/2011 OF MRD MARBLE INC AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON ALL CROSS DEFENDANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/14/11 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP BY HIGH GRADE FORM INC REPRESENTED BY HINES SMITH CARDERDINCEL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 3RD AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LEE CLARK JR SERVED ON P.C. ELECTRIC INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/20/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF OF BAD ADDRESS

DECLARATION OF OF BAD ADDRESS AS TO TRICO FRAMERS INC RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP SERVED ON TRICO FRAMERS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/09/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LEE CLARK JR BY LASCO BATHWARE INC REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF R&S MADRIGA

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF R&S MADRIGAL CONSTRUCTION & SUPPLY INC REPRESENTED BY PRENOVOST NORMANDINBERGH & DAWE FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/20/2012 OF R&S MADRIGAL CONSTRUCTION & SUPPLY INC BY VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, MURRIETA 115/AF XVII, LTD, MURRIETA 64/AF XVIILTD REPRESENTED BY OLIVA & ASSOCIATESALC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

RESPONSE TO OSC

RESPONSE TO OSC

PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPON

PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (FORM CM-200).

NOTICE OF CNTINUED OSC RE DISM

NOTICE OF CNTINUED OSC RE DISMISSAL BY VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP FILED.

313 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SERVED ON (SEE SERVICE LIST) SERVED 04/30/13 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/15/13 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2011 OF VAN DAELE DEVELOPMENT CORP AS TO BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC, CLASSIC PLUMBING INC, EXCEL CABINETS INC, PPT INC, R&S MADRIGAL CONSTRUCTION & SUPPLY INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF MICHAEL S. FAIRCLOTH RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
506 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2011
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 6/17/11 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LEE CLARK JR AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LEE CLARK JR FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2011 OF LEE CLARK JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2011 OF LEE CLARK JR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/21/11 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.