Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 00:26:36 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS WYLCROW

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WYLCROW. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3333

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIBANK, N.A

Defendant

PETER J WYLCROW

Hemet, CA 92543

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of service by Mail of General Denial on Michael S Hunt with a mailing date of 08/16/20 filed. (non-complaint)

08/17/2020: Proof of service by Mail of General Denial on Michael S Hunt with a mailing date of 08/16/20 filed. (non-complaint)

Limited Civil General Denial under $10,000.00 to Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. by PETER J WYLCROW represented by PRO/PER filed.

08/17/2020: Limited Civil General Denial under $10,000.00 to Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. by PETER J WYLCROW represented by PRO/PER filed.

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amounts up to $10,000 including unlawful detainer (GC70614B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/17/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #7349 Receipt No.: CV200817-0095-FE.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of service by Mail of General Denial on Michael S Hunt with a mailing date of 08/16/20 filed. (non-complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil General Denial under $10,000.00 to Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. by PETER J WYLCROW represented by PRO/PER filed.; Filed By: PETER J WYLCROW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on PETER J WYLCROW with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122897 Receipt No.: CV200720-0320-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 11/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant