Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 00:31:27 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS STARTZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STARTZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Candice Garcia-Rodrigo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3360

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Candice Garcia-Rodrigo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIBANK, N.A

Defendant

FARRAR L STARTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

02/02/2021: Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

Request for Dismissal of Complaint per CCP 664.6

02/02/2021: Request for Dismissal of Complaint per CCP 664.6

Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Judgment jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6 on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

02/02/2021: Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Judgment jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6 on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

Stipulation Agreement jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6 on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

02/02/2021: Stipulation Agreement jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6 on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on FARRAR L STARTZ with service date of 08/12/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

08/18/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on FARRAR L STARTZ with service date of 08/12/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re:; Judicial Officer: Candice Garcia-Rodrigo; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Complaint per CCP 664.6; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Judgment jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6 on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation Agreement jurisdiction retained under CCP 664.6 on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amounts up to $10,000 including unlawful detainer (GC70614B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2021; Fine Description: Check #0286 Receipt No.: 20210201-00060.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Stipulation Settlement Agreement and Order/Request for Dismissal CCP 664.6; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on FARRAR L STARTZ with service date of 08/12/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122893 Receipt No.: CV200720-0389-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant