Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 12:21:39 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS ROMINE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROMINE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3321

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIBANK, N.A

Defendant

DONALD E ROMINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

Donald Sherrill

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

05/21/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Judgment by Clerk by Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

05/07/2021: Judgment by Clerk by Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

Declaration of Counsel re: 1) Interest 2) Costs (CCP 1033) 3) Attorney's Fees

01/06/2021: Declaration of Counsel re: 1) Interest 2) Costs (CCP 1033) 3) Attorney's Fees

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

01/06/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to DONALD E ROMINE; mailing date of 08/10/20 filed.

08/14/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to DONALD E ROMINE; mailing date of 08/10/20 filed.

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/24/2021; Fine Description: Check #201198 Receipt No.: 20210524-00029.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; For/Against: For - CITIBANK, N.A. Against - DONALD E ROMINE; Details; Principal: $2,207.38; Costs: $320.00; Subtotal Judgment: $2,527.38; Total: $2,527.38; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 05/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Clerk by Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Counsel re: 1) Interest 2) Costs (CCP 1033) 3) Attorney's Fees; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to DONALD E ROMINE; mailing date of 08/10/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122889 Receipt No.: CV200720-0270-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Disposition: Clerk's Default Judgment 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrill, Donald