Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 00:14:10 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS ROMERO

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROMERO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3496

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A

Defendant

LORETO ROMERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

07/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/23/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Document Return.

04/19/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

04/12/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

03/01/2021: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

System Generated Notice re: OF OSC HEARING.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: OF OSC HEARING.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557-7610.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557-7610.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Default Judgment; Filed By: CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Default Judgment; Filed By: CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: CITIBANK N.A; LORETO ROMERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A; Filed By: CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122938 Receipt No.: CV200723-0037-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF OSC HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557-7610.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant