Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 08:50:27 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS MEEKS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEEKS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3517

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A

Defendant

SYLVIA E MEEKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfied in Full on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

02/08/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfied in Full on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A as to SYLVIA E MEEKS filed.

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A as to SYLVIA E MEEKS filed.

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

10/13/2020: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A served on SYLVIA E MEEKS with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

08/17/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A served on SYLVIA E MEEKS with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

System Generated Notice re: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-0186.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-0186.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A and filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Writ of Execution Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/25/2021; Fine Description: Check #165067 Receipt No.: 20210225-00379.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfied in Full on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A; Filed By: CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2021; Fine Description: Check #151303 Receipt No.: 20210126-00695.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • JudgementStatus: Full Satisfaction of Judgment; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A; For/Against: For - CITIBANK N.A Against - SYLVIA E MEEKS; Details; Principal: $3,161.98; Costs: $320.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Other: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $3,481.98; Writ Fee: $40.00; Total: $3,521.98; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 01/26/2021; Writ of Execution Issued for County: San Bernardino on 02/25/2021 - expires on 08/24/2021; Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfied in Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A as to SYLVIA E MEEKS filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A served on SYLVIA E MEEKS with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122932 Receipt No.: CV200723-0179-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-0186.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant