Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:45:52 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS HORNCASTLE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HORNCASTLE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3308

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

ROBERT HORNCASTLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

02/11/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Judgment by Clerk by Default

01/25/2021: Judgment by Clerk by Default

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA as to ROBERT HORNCASTLE filed.

10/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA as to ROBERT HORNCASTLE filed.

Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

10/22/2020: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA served on ROBERT HORNCASTLE with service date of 09/01/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA

09/10/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA served on ROBERT HORNCASTLE with service date of 09/01/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/16/2021; Fine Description: Check #174031 Receipt No.: 20210216-00268.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Case; For/Against: For - CITIBANK NA Against - ROBERT HORNCASTLE; Details; Costs: $320.00; Damages: $3,614.63; Subtotal Judgment: $3,934.63; Total: $3,934.63; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Clerk by Default; Filed By: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA as to ROBERT HORNCASTLE filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees; Filed By: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA served on ROBERT HORNCASTLE with service date of 09/01/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122880 Receipt No.: CV200720-0225-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA; Disposition: Clerk's Default Judgment 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant