Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 03:10:47 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3503

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIBANK, N.A

Defendant

FRANK GUTIERREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92555-4220.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92555-4220.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #122928 Receipt No.: CV200723-0094-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92555-4220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 12/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant