Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 16:42:13 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS FERGUSON

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FERGUSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3335

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

MARIA L FERGUSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

02/11/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Judgment By Clerk By Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA

01/20/2021: Judgment By Clerk By Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA as to MARIA L FERGUSON filed.

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA as to MARIA L FERGUSON filed.

Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

10/13/2020: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92532.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92532.

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/23/2021; Fine Description: Check #174020 Receipt No.: 20210223-00615.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA; For/Against: For - CITIBANK NA Against - MARIA L FERGUSON; Details; Principal: $5,269.15; Costs: $320.00; Subtotal Judgment: $5,589.15; Total: $5,589.15; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment By Clerk By Default on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA; Filed By: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA as to MARIA L FERGUSON filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees; Filed By: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA served on MARIA L FERGUSON with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #122875 Receipt No.: CV200720-0325-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92532.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of CITIBANK NA; Disposition: Clerk's Default Judgment 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant