Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 10:13:38 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS DUGAN

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUGAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3505

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIBANK, N.A

Defendant

MONIC DUGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

10/13/2020: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to MONIC DUGAN; mailing date of 08/19/20 filed.

08/25/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to MONIC DUGAN; mailing date of 08/19/20 filed.

System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-2211.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-2211.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Writ of Execution Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/25/2021; Fine Description: Check #165075 Receipt No.: 20210225-00555.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/28/2021; Fine Description: Check #153473 Receipt No.: 20210128-00615.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A.; For/Against: For - CITIBANK, N.A. Against - MONIC DUGAN; Details; Principal: $4,300.93; Costs: $320.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Other: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $4,620.93; Writ Fee: $40.00; Total: $4,660.93; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 01/28/2021; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Riverside on 02/25/2021 - expires on 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to MONIC DUGAN filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to MONIC DUGAN; mailing date of 08/19/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #122922 Receipt No.: CV200723-0107-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-2211.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant