Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2017 at 10:01:37 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS DOSAMANTES

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOSAMANTES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5325

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A

Defendant

VIRGINIA DOSAMANTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK N.A AS TO VIRGINIA DOSAMANTES FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK N.A AND FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 06/09/17

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK N.A SERVED ON VIRGINIA DOSAMANTES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/10/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTE

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 & ATTY FEES FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92587-7463.

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 06/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 & ATTY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK N.A AS TO VIRGINIA DOSAMANTES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK N.A SERVED ON VIRGINIA DOSAMANTES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/10/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92587-7463.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 3/16/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK N.A AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    Read MoreRead Less