Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 20:43:47 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS BOLANOS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOLANOS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3199

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK, N.A.

CITIBANK, N.A

Defendant

BLANCA BOLANOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT AND HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road Ste 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

03/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

10/19/2020: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to BLANCA BOLANOS filed.

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to BLANCA BOLANOS filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on BLANCA BOLANOS with service date of 08/09/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A.

08/13/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on BLANCA BOLANOS with service date of 08/09/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A.

System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92503-3657.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92503-3657.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Corona); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/11/2021; Fine Description: Check #165085 Receipt No.: 20210111-00489.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A.; For/Against: Against - BLANCA BOLANOS; Details; Principal: $5,939.04; Costs: $320.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Other: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $6,259.04; Writ Fee: $40.00; Total: $6,299.04; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 11/17/2020; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Los Angeles on 01/11/2021 - expires on 07/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. as to BLANCA BOLANOS filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. served on BLANCA BOLANOS with service date of 08/09/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #122944 Receipt No.: CV200723-0268-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: /of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92503-3657.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK, N.A.; Disposition: Complete 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant