Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2017 at 10:04:27 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS SHAFFER

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 CITIBANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHAFFER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5342

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

ROBERT L SHAFFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICT

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER C CP SECTION 664.6

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509-4258.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK NA SERVED ON ROBERT L SHAFFER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/13/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK NA AND FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER C CP SECTION 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY ROBERT L SHAFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK NA SERVED ON ROBERT L SHAFFER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/13/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF CITIBANK NA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509-4258.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 3/16/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less