Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:59:07 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS FRANCO

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CITIBANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3170

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

PATRICIA FRANCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd #8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

10/19/2020: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA as to PATRICIA FRANCO filed.

10/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA as to PATRICIA FRANCO filed.

DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

10/13/2020: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA served on PATRICIA FRANCO with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA

08/17/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA served on PATRICIA FRANCO with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA

System Generated Notice re: of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: of Department Assignment.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752-2540.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752-2540.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Corona); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/17/2020; Fine Description: Check #151330 Receipt No.: 20201117-00047.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA; For/Against: Against - PATRICIA FRANCO; Details; Principal: $4,484.72; Costs: $320.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Other: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $4,804.72; Total: $4,804.72; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 11/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 AND ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA as to PATRICIA FRANCO filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA served on PATRICIA FRANCO with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #122950 Receipt No.: CV200723-0021-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752-2540.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collections - Corona) of CITIBANK NA; Disposition: Complete 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant