This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/12/2018 at 04:30:01 (UTC).

CINNAMON CREEK VS WOOTEN

Case Summary

On 03/17/2003 CINNAMON CREEK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WOOTEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9344

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINNAMON CREEK APTS

Defendant

CHRIS WOOTEN

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER, STEPHEN C

P.O. Box 2489 28059 Lake Edge Road

Lake Arrowhead, CA 92352

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CINNAMON CREEK APTS

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL D

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/17/03 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS BY CHRIS WOOTEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETA

FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2003
  • DocketOSC RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - CORONA; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2003
  • DocketOSC HEARING RE: JUDGMENT - DISMISSAL; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2003
  • DocketDISMISSAL FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - CORONA; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • DocketCOPIES MADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CINNAMON CREEK APTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2003
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SET ON 4/07/03 AT 11:00 IN DIV C2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS RETURNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/17/03 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION 3/21/03 FOR WAIVER OF FEES PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2003 OF CINNAMON CREEK APTS BY CHRIS WOOTEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2003
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/16/03 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. C2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2003
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURINGER STEPHEN C.