Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 23:45:43 (UTC).

CICIORA VS CUBESMART

Case Summary

On 07/11/2016 CICIORA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CUBESMART. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2404

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES A CICIORA

Lake Forest, CA 92630

Defendants

CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

818 West 7Th St #930

Los Angeles, CA 90017

CUBESMART, LP

3915 Green River Rd.

Corona, CA 92880

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (MORENO VALLEY)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTE ORDER.

1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM A

1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED ON 07/27/16 BY JAMES A CICIORA WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 08/05/16.

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FIL

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

SMALL CLAIMS - 1ST AMENDED PLA

SMALL CLAIMS - 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF JAMES CICIORA RESET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM SERVED ON CUBESMART LP SERVED 09/12/16 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF JAMES CICIORA SERVED ON CUBESMART, LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/12/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $55.00.

AUTHORIZATION FOR ARTHUR SALAI

AUTHORIZATION FOR ARTHUR SALAIZ TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY CUBESMART, LP FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, CUBESMART, LP FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, CUBESMART, LP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR ARTHUR SALAIZ TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY CUBESMART, LP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF JAMES CICIORA SERVED ON CUBESMART, LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/12/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (MORENO VALLEY); Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • FAX FILING BY JAMES A CICIORA ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM SERVED ON CUBESMART LP SERVED 09/12/16 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY JAMES A CICIORA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (MORENO VALLEY); Disposition: Reset Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS - 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF JAMES CICIORA RESET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED ON 07/27/16 BY JAMES A CICIORA WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 08/05/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 8/05/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • 1ST AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF JAMES CICIORA FILED (AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 8/26/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT.MV1 - MORENO VALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (MORENO VALLEY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $10,000 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT MV1. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant