This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/27/2019 at 02:04:56 (UTC).

CHRISTIANA TRUST VS. CARMAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 CHRISTIANA TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARMAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7241

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON

Defendants

SARAH LYNN MCDONALD

MICHAEL CECIL SERRATO

JIMMIE D TAYLOR

ROBERT GOTTE

ROBERT CARMAN

LUCILLE WILLIS

REGINA VENISE WILLIAMS

CHAZ TAYLOR WILLIS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIEVE BRODNAX & STEELE

30 Corporate Park #450

Irvine, CA 92606

Defendant Attorney

REZA WILLIAMS

2400 E Katella Ave Unit 800

Anaheim, CA 92806

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGM

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER MICKIE E REED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AS TO ROBERT CARMAN, ROBERT GOTTE, SARAH LYNN MCDONALD, MICHAEL CECIL SERRATO, JIMMIE D TAYLOR, CHAZ TAYLOR WILLIS, LUCILLE WILLIS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON - PALM SPRINGS (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO REGINA VENISE WILLIAMS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/26/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SARAH LYNN MCDONALD; AND MAILED ON 12/27/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO JIMMIE D TAYLOR; AND MAILED ON 12/27/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MICHAEL CECIL SERRATO; AND MAILED ON 12/27/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO CHAZ TAYLOR WILLIS; AND MAILED ON 12/27/18 FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER MICKIE E REED FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON BY REGINA VENISE WILLIAMS REPRESENTED BY REZA WILLIAMS FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY REGINA VENISE WILLIAMS IS DENIED; HONORABLE JUDGE RONALD L JOHNSON (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO D

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS4 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER MICKIE E REED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY REGINA VENISE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • OSC RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER MICKIE E REED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - PALM SPRINGS; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET ON 2/15/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON - PALM SPRINGS (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER MICKIE E REED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/26/2018 OF CHRISTIANA TRUST ADIVISION OFWILMINGTON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 1/25/19 AT 8:00 IN CUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000 (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less