This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/01/2019 at 00:02:52 (UTC).

CHILDRESS VS K HOVNANIAN'S FOUR SEASONS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 CHILDRESS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against K HOVNANIAN'S FOUR SEASONS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3198

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLORINDA CHILDRESS

GLORIA LAGUNZAD

MARIE MALONE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC

K HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA INC

Cross Defendants

FENCEWORKS INC

TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA INC

SUNWEST STUCCO INC

WALTER'S WHOLESALEELECTRIC CO

WALL DESIGN INC

NISSHO OF CALIFORNIA INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC CO

SC DESIGN INC

BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASDAN LIPPSMITH WEBER TURNER LLP

19900 Macarthur Blvd, Ste 850

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINSWORTH SPECHT CALKINS & GIAMPAOLI LLP

9665 Chesapeake Dr, Ste 305

San Diego, CA 92123

Cross Defendant Attorneys

SKEBBA ISAAC BISHOP & BUECHLER

One Mac Arthur Plc Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

7700 Irvine Center Drive Suite 275

Irvine, CA 92618

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BUECHLER

One Macarthur Place Ste 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

MURCHISON & CUMMING

801 South Grand Ave 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

9325 Sky Park Ct #230

San Diego, CA 92123

MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT LLP

624 South Grand Avenue Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

HAMMONS & BALDINO

2601 Airport Dr #105

Torrance, CA 90505

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF ALAN SHEPARD AS

DECLARATION OF ALAN SHEPARD AS REQUIRED BY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC AS TO WALL DESIGN INC FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.; Disposition: Dismissed

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC AS TO NISSHO OF CALIFORNIA INC FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF CLORINDA CHILDRESS FILED.

DECLARATION OF ALAN SHEPARD AS

DECLARATION OF ALAN SHEPARD AS REQUIRED BY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SETTLEMENT FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY FENCEW

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY FENCEWORKS INC FILED.

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SET

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY FENCEWORKS INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC/APPL/D

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC/APPL/DECL/ORDER RE:GFS-FENCEWORKS SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST SERVED 12/06/18 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OFOSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC AS TO DEFENDANT BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE BY CLORINDA CHILDRESS FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC AS TO SC DESIGN INC FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC AS TO WALL DESIGN INC FILED.

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC/COLLINSWORTH SPECHTCALKINS & GIAMPAOLI LLP IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC AS TO WALL DESIGN INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2017 OF K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ALAN SHEPARD AS REQUIRED BY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • ORDER DETERMINING FENCEWORKS INCS APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF CLORINDA CHILDRESS SERVED ON K HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/09/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ARBITRATION; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF CLORINDA CHILDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/18/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF CLORINDA CHILDRESS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY CLORINDA CHILDRESS, GLORIA LAGUNZAD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 9/18/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 - COMPLEX CASE (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALL DESIGN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where K HOVNANIAN'S FOURSEASONS AT BEAUMONT is a litigant

Latest cases where SC DESIGN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where K HOVANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant