This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 12:39:54 (UTC).

CHEN VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 04/13/2016 CHEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0624

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAY CHEN

Defendant

FERNANDO HERNANDEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MAY CHEN.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) MAY CHEN AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/06/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) MAY CHEN AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/14/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO FERNANDO HERNANDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/14/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MAY CHEN - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY FERNANDO HERNANDEZ IS DEN; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN BY FERNANDO HERNANDEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MAY CHEN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: WRIT SUBMITTED BY MAY CHEN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) MAY CHEN AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/06/16 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER DENIED; FERNANDO HERNANDEZ TO PAY $255.00 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE ORDER. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY FERNANDO HERNANDEZ (FORM FW-001).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN BY FERNANDO HERNANDEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/13/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/13/2016 OF MAY CHEN AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less