This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 11:44:27 (UTC).

CHEN VS BUCKLEY

Case Summary

On 07/18/2014 CHEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BUCKLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1625

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEI CHEN

Hemet, CA 92543

YUNJING ZHANG

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant

LYNNE M BUCKLEY

Murrieta, CA 92563

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION REQ

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION REQUESTING POSTING OF SUMMONS; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2014 OF WEI CHEN BY LYNNE M BUCKLEY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMEN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2014 OF WEI CHEN ON LYNNE M BUCKLEY POSTED AND MAILED ON 07/25/14

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WEI CHEN, YUNJING ZHANG - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

ORDER ON NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DE

ORDER ON NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL DENIED. HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2014 OF WEI CHEN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2014 OF WEI CHEN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 07/25/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/22/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

FILED: EXHIBIT LIST

FILED: EXHIBIT LIST

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WEI CHEN.

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT T1.

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIB

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS.

ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIB

ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED BY JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED BY JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS AS TO LYNNE M BUCKLEY; REASON RETURNED: UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 2/10/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 3/23/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. SWEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT T1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION REQUESTING POSTING OF SUMMONS; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY WEI CHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/16/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less