This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/04/2017 at 17:54:35 (UTC).

CHAFFEE VS STATE OF CALFORNIA DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 CHAFFEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALFORNIA DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5439

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JULIANA CHAFFEE

JAMES CHAFFEE

MOES 1-50

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC

URS CORPORATION

CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC

SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC

ACTUANT CORPORATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENTOF

AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

MOES 1-50

RIVERSIDE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION

ATKINSON-WALSH JOINT VENTURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AITKEN AITKEN COHN

3 Macarthur Place Suite 800

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

G& P SCHICK

3170 Fourth Avenue Third Floor

San Diego, CA 92103

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

1801 Century Park East Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

TYSON & MENDES LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON URS CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/08/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE AS TO SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC; MAILING DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON ACTUANT CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY JAME

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY JAMES CHAFFEE FILED.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE BY SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC REPRESENTED BY G&P SCHICK FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF ACTUANT CORPORATION AND FILED.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • JAMES CHAFFEE, JULIANA CHAFFEE/AITKEN AITKEN COHN IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT/SUMMONS/X COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY ACTUANT CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF ACTUANT CORPORATION AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • -- AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/30/2017 OF ACTUANT CORPORATION (CROSS-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF, SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC, RIVERSIDE COUNTY TRANSPORTATIONCOMMISSION AND MAILED ON 01/30/17 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ACTUANT CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DANIELS FINE ISRAELSCHONBUCH &LEBOVITS FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • FAX FILING BY ACTUANT CORPORATION ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JAMES CHAFFEE BY ACTUANT CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DANIELS FINE ISRAELSCHONBUCH &LEBOVITS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 3/29/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON URS CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE SERVED ON SEQUOIA CONSULTANTSINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/02/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/20/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF JAMES CHAFFEE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where URS CORPORATION is a litigant