Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:27:17 (UTC).

CERVANTES VS ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CERVANTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5351

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELIX CERVANTES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SGH PARTNERS

ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY INC

SG&H PARTNERS L.P.

NAI CAPITAL MANAGEMENT INC

ROES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALHOTRA & MALHOTRA

7847 Florence Ave #111

Downey, CA 90240

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN MORENO

Po Box 14503

Des Moines, IA 50306-3503

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER& LOWARY

3890 Tenth St 2Nd Flr

Riverside, CA 92501

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

Po Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SG&H PARTNERS L.P..

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SG&H PARTNE

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SG&H PARTNERS L.P. REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SG&H PARTNERS L.P. FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO CONT. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T LATTING.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2016 OF FELIX CERVANTES NAMING DOES 1 TO BE NAI CAPITAL MANAGEMENT INC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANA

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (2017 AUGUST 24) FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/06/2017 OF ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEYINC NAMING ROES/MOES 02 TO BE SG&H PARTNERS L.P. FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2018 OF NAI CAPITAL MANAGEMENT INC BY ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEYINC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN MORENO FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FELIX CERVANTES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FELIX CERVANTES

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON MARTIN MORENO WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/15/18 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

FILED: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION T

FILED: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE IN PLFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MEDIATION PROGRAM HEARING.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY INC.

OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS EVIDENCE I

OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPO BY ROCK CHRUCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY INC FILED

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNTIM

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNTIMELY AMENDED RESPONSE BY ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 10/09/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT'S RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION DATED 07/11/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2016 OF FELIX CERVANTES BY ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEYINC; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNTIMELY AMENDED RESPONSE BY ROCK CHURCH OF COACHELLA VALLEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT/UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FILED BY FELIX CERVANTES

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 12/20/16 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2016 OF FELIX CERVANTES SERVED ON SGH PARTNERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/17/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2016 OF FELIX CERVANTES SERVED ON SGH PARTNERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92211.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/20/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/21/2016 OF FELIX CERVANTES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nai Capital Management Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO MARTIN