This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/12/2018 at 00:14:29 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV VS. MOSES

Case Summary

On 10/31/2002 CAVALRY SPV filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOSES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8435

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPC I LLC

Defendant

EDWARD MOSES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EDGAR J LANA

3730 Mount Diablo Blvd Ste 340 Po Box 1268

Lafayette, CA 94549

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, EDWARD MOSES FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; LO

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

ORDER FOR COPY IN LIEU OF ORIG

ORDER FOR COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE E. MICHAEL KAISER.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 05/12/03

585 DECL IN SUPPORT OF APPL FO

585 DECL IN SUPPORT OF APPL FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION FOR JUDGMENT BY CAVALRY SPC I LLC FILED PER 313/317 CRC

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION FOR J

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION FOR JUDGMENT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPC I LLC

DECLARATION OF OF ATTORNEY IN

DECLARATION OF OF ATTORNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2002 OF CAVALRY SPC I LLC AS TO EDWARD MOSES FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2002 OF CAVALRY SPC I LLC RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2002 OF CAVALRY SPC I LLC SERVED ON EDWARD MOSES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/11/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, EDWARD MOSES FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: WRIT/MEMO OF COST/CK#017469 SUBMITTED BY CAVALRY SPC I LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2003
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2003
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $131.81 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $25.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2003
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE E. MICHAEL KAISER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPC I LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF OF ATTORNEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2002 OF CAVALRY SPC I LLC AS TO EDWARD MOSES FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2002 OF CAVALRY SPC I LLC RETURNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2002 OF CAVALRY SPC I LLC SERVED ON EDWARD MOSES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/11/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2002
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/16/03 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2002
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 03 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant