Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 11:56:37 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I,LLC VS ABOH

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 CAVALRY SPV I,LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ABOH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0522

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

FELIX ABOH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP

The Chapman Building 110 E Wilshire Ave Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPRTMENT.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 05/16/2014 OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC SERVED ON FELIX ABOH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/01/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 05/16/2014 OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 05/16/2014 OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS TO FELIX ABOH FILED.

DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTI

DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED FILED

DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTOR

DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 07/14/14

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $474.06 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $383.98 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (BANNING).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 07/14/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 05/16/2014 OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 05/16/2014 OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC SERVED ON FELIX ABOH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/01/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) BANNING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 5/13/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPRTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant