Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 15:35:43 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I VS FAUST

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CAVALRY SPV I filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FAUST. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3504

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

COURTNEY B FAUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

P.O. Box 109032

Chicago, IL 60610

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

01/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC as to COURTNEY B FAUST; mailing date of 08/20/20 filed.

08/26/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC as to COURTNEY B FAUST; mailing date of 08/20/20 filed.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

Declaration of Venue filed

07/20/2020: Declaration of Venue filed

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223-8024.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223-8024.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC and filed.

Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC

07/20/2020: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC as to COURTNEY B FAUST; mailing date of 08/20/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #835525 Receipt No.: CV200723-0095-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Venue filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223-8024.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant