Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 21:21:24 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS CHONG

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHONG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell L Moore and Russell L. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0119

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Russell L Moore

Russell L. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLCAS ASSIGNEEOF CITIBANK

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendant

TAE CHONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 E Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Blythe)

07/16/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Blythe)

Plaintiff's OSC Response Re:Default Judgement with Declaration

06/23/2021: Plaintiff's OSC Response Re:Default Judgement with Declaration

Notice to Defendant re Extension of Time to File a Response. Date of mailing 11/10/2020

11/16/2020: Notice to Defendant re Extension of Time to File a Response. Date of mailing 11/10/2020

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA served on TAE CHONG with service date of 08/21/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

08/26/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA served on TAE CHONG with service date of 08/21/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92225-4923.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92225-4923.

Notice of Collection Case Assigned to Department 260. (Blythe)

07/20/2020: Notice of Collection Case Assigned to Department 260. (Blythe)

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Blythe)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Blythe)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Blythe); Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Blythe); Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department 260; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Blythe)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Court Default Judgment; Filed By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (Fair Debt Buying Act)(CIV-105) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA; Filed By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's OSC Response Re:Default Judgement with Declaration; Filed By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice to Defendant re Extension of Time to File a Response. Date of mailing 11/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA served on TAE CHONG with service date of 08/21/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #0915837 Receipt No.: CV200723-0007-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92225-4923.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Collection Case Assigned to Department 260. (Blythe)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Blythe)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant