This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 12:21:14 (UTC).

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO VS. BUTLER

Case Summary

On 12/12/2005 CAVALRY PORTFOLIO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BUTLER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3327

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

Defendant

DENNIS BUTLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 E Wilshire Avenue Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORP

110 E Wilshire Ave, Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $18.9

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $18.91.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED; CHANGE FIRM WINN AND SIMS APC FOR PARTY(S) CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC TO FIRM WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $18.9

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $18.91.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED $18

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED $18.91 COLLECTED RIVERSIDE COUNTY COUNTY

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED (ENTIRE ACTION)

DECLARATION OF RE WAIVER OF AT

DECLARATION OF RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTI

DECLARATION OF UNDERLYING ACTION OF OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT FILED

DECLARATION OF LOST SUMMONS AF

DECLARATION OF LOST SUMMONS AFTER SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC FILED.

DECLARATION OF RE INTEREST FIL

DECLARATION OF RE INTEREST FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS TO DENNIS BUTLER

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS TO DENNIS BUTLER; MAILING DATE OF 12/29/05 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; IMPERIAL COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $18.91.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $2567.73 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $93.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED; CHANGE FIRM WINN AND SIMS APC FOR PARTY(S) CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC TO FIRM WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $18.91.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1032.15 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $48.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED $18.91 COLLECTED RIVERSIDE COUNTY COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RE INTEREST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS TO DENNIS BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2006
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS TO DENNIS BUTLER (SINGLE DEFENDANT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: DECL OF LOST SUMMONS/REQ DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2005 OF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS TO DENNIS BUTLER; MAILING DATE OF 12/29/05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant