Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2016 at 06:33:20 (UTC).

CAT FINANCIAL VS TOWER

Case Summary

On 06/14/2013 CAT FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2661

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNT CORP

Defendants

TOWER FOUNDATIONS INC

J & H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC

TFI/J & H ENG JV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAN L. BRODKIN & ASSOCIATES

15500 B Rockfield Blvd

Irvine, CA 92618

ALAN L BRODKIN & ASSOCIATES

15500 B Rockfield Blvd

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

BRIAN K WILLIAMS LAW GROUP

515 South Flower St #3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

V. EMILE BROWN

515 S. Flower St, Ste 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92567.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AS TO TOWER FOUNDATIONS INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/06/13 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AS TO TFI/J & H ENG JV; MAILING DATE OF 07/06/13 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTIO

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP FOR COLLECTIONS - OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC3.740 BY TOWER FOUNDATIONS INC REPRESENTED BY BRIAN K WILLIAMS LAW GROUP FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTIO

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP FOR COLLECTIONS - OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC3.740 BY J & H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC REPRESENTED BY BRIAN K WILLIAMS LAW GROUP FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTIO

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP FOR COLLECTIONS - OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC3.740 BY TFI/J & H ENG JV REPRESENTED BY BRIAN K WILLIAMS LAW GROUP FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AS TO J & H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/10/13 FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF RESCHEDULING OF MSC HEARING AND COURT TRIAL.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP REMOVE ATTORNEY BRIAN K WILLIAMS LAW GROUP FOR PARTY(S) TFI/J & H ENG JV AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY V. EMILE BROWN

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (TEMECULA).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTION); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 3/07/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S101.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • FAX FILING BY CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2013
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTION) SET 1/31/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP FOR COLLECTIONS - OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC3.740 BY TOWER FOUNDATIONS INC REPRESENTED BY BRIAN K WILLIAMS LAW GROUP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AS TO TFI/J & H ENG JV; MAILING DATE OF 07/06/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AS TO TOWER FOUNDATIONS INC; MAILING DATE OF 07/06/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION - TEMECULA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) TEMECULA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 6/12/14 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. T1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - TEMECULA) FILED 06/14/2013 OF CAT FINANCIAL COMMERCIALACCOUNTCORP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92567.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J & H Engineering General Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN V EMILE