This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 19:11:01 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC VS BATIZ

Case Summary

On 09/23/2011 CASHCALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BATIZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0340

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

RENE BATIZ

Assignee

SUNLAN LDP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGME

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 09/23/2011 OF CASHCALL INC FOR CASHCALL INC ASSIGNED TO SUNLAN LDP LLC FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 09/23/2011 OF CASHCALL INC REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) CASHCALL INC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HEARING.

REQUEST TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

REQUEST TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL DUE TO BREACH OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILE BY CASH CALL INC

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 09/23/2011 OF CASHCALL INC AS TO RENE BATIZ, MAILING DATE OF 12/30/11 FILED. COSTS OF $22.50.

NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS

NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 01/23/12 @ 01:30 IN DEPT. B1

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER ON RENE BATIZ FILED

NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS

NOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 11/21/11 @ 01:30 IN DEPT. B1

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FIL

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE THAN 12 PER YEAR)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $302.69 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 09/23/2011 OF CASHCALL INC FOR CASHCALL INC ASSIGNED TO SUNLAN LDP LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 09/23/2011 OF CASHCALL INC REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) CASHCALL INC AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: SUBSTITUTIONOF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY CASHCALL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: SUB OF ATTY/ASSIGN JUDGE/MEMO COSTS/WRIT OF EXECUT SUBMITTED BY CASHCALL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Docket--AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $43.86 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER ON RENE BATIZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketHSCB1 HEARING SET FOR 10/24/11 AT 01:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 11/21/11, AT 13:30, IN B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RE-SET SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 11/21/11 @ 01:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 10/24/11, AT 13:30, IN B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE THAN 12 PER YEAR)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNLAN LDP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant