This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 00:49:24 (UTC).

CARRERA vs FARMERS GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 CARRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS GROUP INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG G. RIEMER, Irma Asberry and IRMA POOLE ASBERRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3878

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

CRAIG G. RIEMER

Irma Asberry

IRMA POOLE ASBERRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUAN CARRERA

SHEENA FUGGINS

Defendants

FARMERS GROUP INC

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

LANCE STEVENS

RUTH GAPIO MUNOZ

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

FARMERS UNDERWRITER ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAMIANI LAW GROUP APC

Attorney at DAMIANI LAW GROUP APC

1059 Tenth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

555 S. Flower St. 45Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint of CARRERA by FARMERS GROUP INC, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH GAPIO MUNOZ

05/29/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint of CARRERA by FARMERS GROUP INC, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH GAPIO MUNOZ

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike 1st Amended Complaint of CARRERA by FARMERS GROUP INC, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH GAPIO MUNOZ represented by HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

05/29/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike 1st Amended Complaint of CARRERA by FARMERS GROUP INC, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, RUTH GAPIO MUNOZ represented by HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

Notice of Document Return.

08/10/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial

08/06/2021: Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial

Trial Setting Order

08/06/2021: Trial Setting Order

Minute Order: Jury Trial

08/20/2021: Minute Order: Jury Trial

Minute Order: Joint Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial & trial readiness conference or, in the alternative, an order shortening time for hearing of Motion to continue trial

08/06/2021: Minute Order: Joint Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial & trial readiness conference or, in the alternative, an order shortening time for hearing of Motion to continue trial

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

08/06/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on 1st Amended Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

Minute Order: Jury Trial

05/07/2021: Minute Order: Jury Trial

Minute Order: Jury Trial

03/26/2021: Minute Order: Jury Trial

Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: to Extend Trial Date

08/06/2021: Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re: to Extend Trial Date

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

08/05/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

Proof of Electronic Service

08/04/2021: Proof of Electronic Service

Declaration of Richard E. Morton in Support of Motion to Continue Trial and Trial Readiness Confere

08/04/2021: Declaration of Richard E. Morton in Support of Motion to Continue Trial and Trial Readiness Confere

Declaration of Lisa J. Damiani in Support of Joint Ex Parte Application and Motion to Continue the Trial Date and Trial Readiness Conference

08/04/2021: Declaration of Lisa J. Damiani in Support of Joint Ex Parte Application and Motion to Continue the Trial Date and Trial Readiness Conference

Joint Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial & trial readiness conference or, in the alternative, an order shortening time for hearing of Motion to continue trial on 2nd Amended Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

08/04/2021: Joint Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial & trial readiness conference or, in the alternative, an order shortening time for hearing of Motion to continue trial on 2nd Amended Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Parties Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and TRC

08/02/2021: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Parties Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and TRC

Parties Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and TRC

08/02/2021: Parties Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and TRC

152 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Continue Trial and Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingType: Joint Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial & trial readiness conference or, in the alternative, an order shortening time for hearing of Motion to continue trial; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingType: Ex Parte Hearing re: to Extend Trial Date; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Joint Ex Parte Application for an order continuing trial & trial readiness conference or, in the alternative, an order shortening time for hearing of Motion to continue trial

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of CARRERA served on LANCE STEVENS with service date of 12/26/18 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of JUAN CARRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of CARRERA as to FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; mailing date of 11/30/18 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of CARRERA as to FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY INC; mailing date of 11/30/18 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of CARRERA as to FARMERS GROUP INC; mailing date of 11/30/18 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/13/2018; Fine Description: American Express Receipt No.: CV181113-0257-AE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92506.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of CARRERA and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS GROUP INC DBA FARMERS UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant