Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/02/2018 at 16:03:17 (UTC).

CARAMEL PROPERTIES VS THE MUKESHA PATEL

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 CARAMEL PROPERTIES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE MUKESHA PATEL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1165

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CARMEL PROPERTIES INC

CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE MUKESH PATEL AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST

AMBOO R PATEL

MUKESH A PATEL

HANSA A PATEL

SURYA M PATEL

MUKESH AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST DATED

MUKESH K. PATEL

Cross Defendants

RAMEN PATEL

NEELA PATEL

CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CALIMING ANY LEGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

WAGNER & PELAYES LLP

1325 Spruce St, #200

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WARD LAW GROUP

44651 Village Court #121

Palm Desert, CA 92260

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SURYA M PAT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SURYA M PATEL, AMBOO R PATEL, HANSA A PATEL, MUKESH K. PATEL REPRESENTED BY WARD LAW GROUP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/12/2017 OF SURYA PATEL AND FILED.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/12/2017 OF SURYA PATEL AS TO RAMEN PATEL WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/07/17

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/12/2017 OF SURYA PATEL AS TO NEELA PATEL WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/07/17

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC, RAMEN PATEL, NEELA PATEL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SURYA M PATEL, AMBOO R PATEL, HANSA A PATEL, MUKESH AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST DATED, MUKESH K. PATEL FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MINUTE ORDER: SETTING ASIDE TH

MINUTE ORDER: SETTING ASIDE THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED 8/3/17

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON X-C AS TO ALL UNKNOWN FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (COPY) F

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (COPY) FILED BY CARMEL PROPERTIES INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/03/2017 OF CARMEL PROPERTIES INC AS TO THE MUKESH PATEL AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST; MAILING DATE OF 03/07/17 FILED.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARME

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEL PROPERTIES INC FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEL PROPERTIES INC AS TO THE MUKESH PATEL AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 04/13/17

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEL PROPERTIES INC AS TO THE MUKESH PATEL AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPL

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARMEL PROPERTIES INC NAMING DOES 004 TO BE HANSA A PATEL FILED.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/12/2017 OF SURYA PATEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC/WAGNER & PELAYES LLP IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • HOASFD HEARING SET FOR 11/13/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: PARTIES ANSWERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • UPDATE CASE NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • UPDATE PARTY CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA (CORRECTING PLAINTIFF MISPELLED NAMED) BY CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON X-C AS TO ALL UNKNOWN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SURYA M PATEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY SURYA M PATEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC ON THE MUKESH PATEL AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST WITH DATE OF MAILING 04/03/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/03/2017 OF CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC AS TO THE MUKESH PATEL AND SURYA PATEL 2001 TRUST; MAILING DATE OF 03/07/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (COPY) FILED BY CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/02/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/03/2017 OF CARAMEL PROPERTIESINC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less