This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:13:37 (UTC).

CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING VS MENIFEE PARTNERS

Case Summary

On 11/13/2012 CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MENIFEE PARTNERS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6688

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P.

EARL FRASER CONSTRUCTIONINC

PACIFIC AGGREGATESINC.

T.B. PENICK AND SONS INC

CANYON RIDGE CONSTRUCTION INC.

VARNER CONSTRUCTION INC.

RSC EQUIPMENT

RECYCLED AGGREGATEMATERIALS COMPANY INC

MATT GARDNERCONSTRUCTION INC.

JOHN B EWLES INC.

ROBERT CLAPPER CONSTRUCTION INC.

PRODIGY ELECTRIC INC.

SO CAL GLASS INC.

INLAND EROSION CONTROL SERVICES INC.

KNUDSEN GRADING COMPANY INC

EXCEL SALES&SERVICES INC

D.P. MANGAN INC.

HOMELAND PROTECTION SERVICES

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIELDS LAW GROUP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

EPSTEN, GRINNELL & HOWELL

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2013 OF MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P. SERVED ON AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMITY COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/08/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE OF A

DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MENIFEE PAR

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P. REPRESENTED BY EPSTEN, GRINNELL &HOWELL FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC BY MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P., OTROSPA CORP, SPATHCO, TEOFILO HAMUI REPRESENTED BY EPSTEN, GRINNELL &HOWELL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE SERVICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PVM LATH & PLASTER FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO PVM LATH & PLASTER FILED.

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS HRG: 021313

DECLARATION OF OF ELIZABETH M

DECLARATION OF OF ELIZABETH M OTLEY RE:NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING BY PLAINTIFF FILED FILED

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P. WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/21/12

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO SPATHCO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/21/12

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO TRI COUNTY SANDBLASTING INC. FILED.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO OTROSPA CORP WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/21/12

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92584.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/13/2013

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2013

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO ANY REMAINING UNSERVED DEFTS/X-DEFTS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED PRIOR TO 03/12/13; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2013

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2013 OF MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P.. (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2013 OF MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P. SERVED ON AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMITY COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/08/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2013

DocketCOPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RIC1216688; RIC1202449 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2013
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION OF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P. REPRESENTED BY EPSTEN, GRINNELL &HOWELL FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2013
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC BY MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P., OTROSPA CORP, SPATHCO, TEOFILO HAMUI REPRESENTED BY EPSTEN, GRINNELL &HOWELL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE SERVICE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2013
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PVM LATH & PLASTER FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
12/27/2012
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO MENIFEE PARTNERS L.P. WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/21/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2012
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO SPATHCO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/21/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2012
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO TRI COUNTY SANDBLASTING INC. FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2012
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC AS TO OTROSPA CORP WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/21/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2012

DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT SUBMITTED BY CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2012 OF CAMBRIDGE CONTRACTING GROUP INC FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92584.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05. (RIVERSIDE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012

DocketCASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2012
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less