This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/07/2016 at 12:18:56 (UTC).

CAL-DUCT VS THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 02/09/2011 CAL-DUCT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMPSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2095

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAL-DUCT INC

Defendants

KEN THOMPSON

LYMAN CARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ALEX GILANIANS APLC

100 W Broadway Suite 1250

Glendale, CA 91210

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC AND FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIA

DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIANS RE OSC RE FAILURE TO SERVE SUMMO FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC AS TO LYMAN CARTER; MAILING DATE OF 03/26/12 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC AS TO LYMAN CARTER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC SERVED ON KEN THOMPSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/16/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC AS TO KEN THOMPSON FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE.

DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIA

DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF OF KATHY WALTER

DECLARATION OF OF KATHY WALTERS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585(D)) FILED FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF AT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD BY CAL-DUCT INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIA

DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 05/20/13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 12/26/12; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 05/20/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD BY CAL-DUCT INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF KATHY WALTERS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585(D)) FILED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF ALEX GILANIANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 12/26/12; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2012
  • SANCTIONS PAID BY LAW OFFICES OF ALEXGILANIANS APLC ATTORNEY FOR CAL-DUCT INC IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • OSC HEARING RE: WHY SANCTIONS OF $300.00 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC, AGAINST LAW OFFICES OF ALEXGILANIANS APLC AND/OR CLIENT(S) FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS ON 02/06/12.; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740.; Disposition: SANCTIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 2/06/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION) FILED 02/09/2011 OF CAL-DUCT INC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES (COLLECTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 05 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-DUCT INC is a litigant