This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 19:38:28 (UTC).

CAH VS ALLEN

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 CAH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALLEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1335

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAH 2014-1 BORROWER LLC

Defendant

NIKENA ALLEN

Murrieta, CA 92530

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/13/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC BY NIKENA ALLEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/09/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO NIKENA ALLEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/09/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/08/17 S205 PRO TEM ROBERT ENGLISH)

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY CAH 2

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC FILED.

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONOR

JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK .

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/13/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: COMPLAINCE WITH STIPULATION; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/09/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC BY NIKENA ALLEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/10/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2017 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWERLLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less