Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 10:29:45 (UTC).

CAH 2014-1 VS FANNING

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 CAH 2014-1 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FANNING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0320

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAH 2014-1 BORROWER

Defendants

JOSEPH FANNING

DALLIIS FANNING

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92583.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER SERVED ON JOSEPH FANNING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/25/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER AS TO DALLIIS FANNING; MAILING DATE OF 02/26/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/25/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/15/16

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER AS TO DALLIIS FANNING, JOSEPH FANNING, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWER.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CAH 2014-1 BORROWER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER AS TO DALLIIS FANNING, JOSEPH FANNING, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/15/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/25/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER AS TO DALLIIS FANNING; MAILING DATE OF 02/26/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/24/2016 OF CAH 2014-1 BORROWER SERVED ON JOSEPH FANNING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/25/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 4/25/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92583.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less