This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 07:14:22 (UTC).

CACH LLC VS FOUST

Case Summary

On 02/04/2014 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOUST. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0135

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

AARON FOUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave Suite 850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

9200 Oakdale Avenue, Suite 601

Chatsworth, CA 91311

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC 3.740 FIILED.

DECLARATION OF OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF OF VENUE FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 02/04/2014 OF CACH LLC SERVED ON AARON FOUST WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 02/04/2014 OF CACH LLC FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 02/04/2014 OF CACH LLC AS TO AARON FOUST FILED.

DECLARATION OF ACCEPTING COPIE

DECLARATION OF ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY CACH LLC

DECLARATION OF CALCULATION OF

DECLARATION OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 04/24/14

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMO

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLTFS ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP BY CACH LLC FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION/ LA COUNTY/UNSATISFIED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION/ LA COUNTY/UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/O PREJUDICE SUBMITTED BY CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF EXECUTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $863.80 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLTFS ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP BY CACH LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON CACH LLC FROM MANDARICH LAW GROUPLLP TO MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (BANNING).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: WRIT OF EXECUTION SUBMITTED BY CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 02/04/2014 OF CACH LLC SERVED ON AARON FOUST WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/15/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION) BANNING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 2/04/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OVER $10,000 AND LESS THAN $25,000 CRC 3.740 FIILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant