This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/06/2022 at 00:28:56 (UTC).

CACH LLC VS ESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 08/27/2013 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0924

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

ERIKA ESPINOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

08/27/2014: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

Notice of Reassignment of Department to Department 11. (Commissioner)

01/12/2016: Notice of Reassignment of Department to Department 11. (Commissioner)

Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, ERIKA ESPINOZA filed.

01/12/2016: Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, ERIKA ESPINOZA filed.

Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP by CACH LLC filed.

02/06/2015: Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP by CACH LLC filed.

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

10/30/2014: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 09/10/14

09/10/2014: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 09/10/14

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony pursuant to CCP 585 filed.

09/10/2014: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony pursuant to CCP 585 filed.

Declaration of Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed

09/10/2014: Declaration of Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed

Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by CACH LLC

09/10/2014: Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by CACH LLC

Declaration of Calculation of Accrued Interest & Attorney Fees filed

09/10/2014: Declaration of Calculation of Accrued Interest & Attorney Fees filed

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC filed.

09/10/2014: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC filed.

Request for Entry of Clerk Default Judgment (Default Only previously entered) filed.

09/10/2014: Request for Entry of Clerk Default Judgment (Default Only previously entered) filed.

Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC as to ERIKA ESPINOZA filed.

08/26/2014: Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC as to ERIKA ESPINOZA filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC served on ERIKA ESPINOZA with service date of 09/03/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC

09/12/2013: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC served on ERIKA ESPINOZA with service date of 09/03/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC

Declaration of OF VENUE filed

08/27/2013: Declaration of OF VENUE filed

System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

08/27/2013: System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

System Generated Notice re: OSC.

08/27/2013: System Generated Notice re: OSC.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223.

08/27/2013: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Department to Department 11. (Commissioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, ERIKA ESPINOZA filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP by CACH LLC filed.; Filed By: CACH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/30/2014; Fine Description: Check #142840 Receipt No.: CV141030-0308-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).; Location/Courtroom: Department B1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/16/2014; Fine Description: Check #141942 Receipt No.: CV141016-0085-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC; For/Against: Against - ERIKA ESPINOZA; Details; Principal: $5,525.08; Costs: $315.00; Accrued Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $5,840.08; Total: $5,840.08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 09/10/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony pursuant to CCP 585 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default ONLY on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC as to ERIKA ESPINOZA filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC served on ERIKA ESPINOZA with service date of 09/03/13 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/27/2013; Fine Description: Check #5869 Receipt No.: CV130827-0060-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of OF VENUE filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of CACH LLC; Disposition: Complete 09/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant