This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/05/2020 at 01:07:03 (UTC).

BURLEIGH VS MARRIOTT VACATIONS

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 BURLEIGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARRIOTT VACATIONS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7580

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAUL BURLEIGH

Los Angeles, CA 90017

KARYN BURLEIGH

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendants

DESERT SPRINGS MARRIOTT LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC

MARRIOTT DESERT SPRINGS CORPORATION

DESERT SPRINGS GOLF COURSE

HOST DSM LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MARRIOTT VACATION CLUB RESORTSINC

HMC DESERT LLC

MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC

MARRIOTT VACATIONSWORLDWIDE CORPORATION

JW MARRIOTT DESERTSPRINGS RESPORT AND SPA

MARRIOTT DESERT SPRINGS VILLASII

CCMH PALM DESERT LLC

DS HOTEL LLC

MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

21804 Cactus Ave #200

Riverside, CA 92518-3010

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIR

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY PAUL H BURLEIGH FILED.

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT IS RESCHEDULED TO 03/16/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONA

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT ( FIRST FILED BY AL GERISCH (FORM ADR-100).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HRG RE DISMISSAL.

MEDIATOR'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANC

MEDIATOR'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OR RECUSAL TO COURT ORDERED MEDIATION FILED BY AL GERISCH. (ASSIGNMENT)

NOTICE OF COURT ASSIGNED MEDIA

NOTICE OF COURT ASSIGNED MEDIATOR - MAG

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARRIOTT VACATIONSWORLDWIDE CORPORATION, HMC DESERT LLC, MARRIOTT RESORT HOSPITALITY CORP, CCMH PALM DESERT LLC, DS HOTEL LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KARYN BURLEIGH, PAUL BURLEIGH

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY KARYN BURLEIGH, PAUL BURLEIGH.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC, HMC DESERT LLC

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC, HMC DESERT LLC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF KARYN BURLEIGH NAMING DOES 2 TO BE CCMH PALM DESERT LLC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOE AMENDM

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOE AMENDMENTS/REQUEST FOR DISMISSALS SERVED ON WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN SERVED 05/10/19 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF KARYN BURLEIGH AS TO DEFENDANT HOST DSM LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF KARYN BURLEIGH SERVED ON MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/01/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED O

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED ON 12/07/18 BY KARYN BURLEIGH WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 01/08/19.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CIVIL MINUTE ORDER.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY PAUL H BURLEIGH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AGREEMENT/NONAGREEMENT DUE - CLERK'S CALENDAR.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketHOSCDA HEARING SET FOR 03/18/20 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: RESCHEDULED TO 3/16/20 IN DEPT PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT IS RESCHEDULED TO 03/16/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HRG RE DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT ( FIRST FILED BY AL GERISCH (FORM ADR-100).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL FROM MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 1/08/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED ON 12/07/18 BY KARYN BURLEIGH WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 01/08/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CIVIL MINUTE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF KARYN BURLEIGH AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less