Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 08:36:52 (UTC).

BURLEIGH VS DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/15/2003 BURLEIGH filed an Other lawsuit against DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3543

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LORRAINE BURLEIGH

ROBERT WAYNE BURLEIGH

Defendants

DESERT RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP

LARUE LA PORT P.A

LUDWIG CIBELLI, M.D.

JAY B FEDERHART MD

DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

GLEN GRAYMAN, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEGLAND, LEIGHTON B.

41935 Harrison

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant Attorneys

COTKIN COLLINS & GINSBURG

200 W Santa Ana Blvd #800 Po Box 22005

Santa Ana, CA 92702-2005

CREASON & AARVIG LLP

32 Executive Park Suite 105

Irvine, CA 92614-4722

LUBRANI & SMITH

10370 Hemet Street Suite 390

Riverside, CA 92503

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

ORIGNIAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGNIAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH FILED

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH AS TO DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 01/30/03

FILED: DESIGNATION OF TRIAL CO

FILED: DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL BY LUDWIG AND GRAYMAN

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS FILED BY LUDWIG CIBELLI AND GLEN GRAYMAN

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY GLEN

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY GLEN GRAYMAN, M.D., LUDWIG CIBELLI, M.D. FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY J

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JAY B FEDERHART MD FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

STATEMENT (SEPARATE) OF UNDISP

STATEMENT (SEPARATE) OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS FILED BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

DECLARATION OF JOEL S KAHN FIL

DECLARATION OF JOEL S KAHN FILED

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES BY LUDWIG CIBELLI, M.D. FILED.

STIPULATION RE TELEPHONE AVAIL

STIPULATION RE TELEPHONE AVAILABILITY OF INSURANCE REPRESENTATIVE FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/DESERT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH AS TO DEFENDANT DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH S

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT W/ DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES STAFFORD HAWKINS.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMA

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE DOUGLAS P MILLER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH AS TO DEFENDANT JAY B FEDERHART MD FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POST

ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POSTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 BY LUBRANI & SMITH ON 04/01/04. SIGNED, HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY. (NOT USED SINCE 2010)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2007
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2006
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO COTKINS COLLINS AND GINSBURG DOC#1900376385, IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO CREASON AND AARVIG DOC#1900344675, IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO LUBRANI AND SMITH DOC#1900338290, IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POSTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 BY LUBRANI & SMITH ON 04/01/04. SIGNED, HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY. (NOT USED SINCE 2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POSTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00 BY COTKIN COLLINS & GINSBURG ON 04/05/06. SIGNED, HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY. (NOT USED SINCE 2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POSTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 BY CREASON & AARVIG LLP ON 03/22/04. SIGNED, HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY. (NOT USED SINCE 2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS FILED BY LUDWIG CIBELLI AND GLEN GRAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL BY LUDWIG AND GRAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH BY GLEN GRAYMAN, M.D., LUDWIG CIBELLI, M.D. REPRESENTED BY CREASON & AARVIG LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH BY DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH AS TO DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 01/30/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2003
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT SUBMITTED BY LORRAINE BURLEIGH, ROBERT WAYNE BURLEIGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGNIAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF LORRAINE BURLEIGH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERA CALIFORNIA is a litigant